Elkhuizen, Carola Ester Maria (CPSO#: 79332)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
PO Box 179
186 Marsh Street
Clarksburg ON  N0H 1J0
Phone: (519) 599-5775
Fax: (519) 599-7140
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Carola Elkhuizen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 02 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Elkhuizen ( CPSO# 79332 )

Business Address:
186 Marsh Street
Clarksburg ON  N0H 1J0
Phone Number: (519) 599-5775

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 May 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROLA ESTER MARIA ELKHUIZEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELKHUIZEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 02 Jul 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 02 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 06 Sep 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 07 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2007 to 14 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Dec 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2008