Ellen, Ruth Lesley Bramme (CPSO#: 76310)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bruyère Memory Program
Élisabeth Bruyère Hospital
75 Bruyère St, Suite 342Y
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C8
Phone: (613) 562-6322
Fax: (613) 562-6013
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Perley & Rideau Veterans'
Health Centre
Clinical Director, PATH
1750 Russell Road
Ottawa ON  K1G 5Z6
Canada
Phone: (613) 526-7170
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ellen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 03 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Ellen ( CPSO# 76310 )

Business Address:
342Y-75 Bruyere Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C8

Business Address:
1750 Russel Road
Ottawa ON  K1G 5Z6
Phone Number: (613) 726-7170

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Jul 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 23 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RUTH LESLEY BRAMME ELLEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELLEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Geriatric Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Geriatric Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2009