Elliott, Lori Theresa (CPSO#: 72530)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: Shields, Lori Theresa (used until: 22 Oct 1998 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Branford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill
Branford, Ontario
N3R 1G9
Brantford ON  L7N 3N8
Phone: 5197515544
Fax: 5197515570
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3351 Harvester Road
Suite 308
Burlington ON  L7N 3N8
Canada
Phone: 289 217 7947
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Wade Elliott Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 4 2009


Corporation Name: Drs. W & L Elliott Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 09 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Elliott ( CPSO# 72530 )
Dr. W. Elliott ( CPSO# 71140 )

Business Address:
Suite 302
3155 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3N8
Phone Number: (289) 217-7947

Business Address:
Levy Elliot Sports Medicine Clinic
102 - 1100 Walkers Line
Burlington ON  L7N 2G3
Phone Number: (905) 336-3340

Business Address:
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone Number: (519) 751-5544

Business Address:
Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100


Corporation Name: Dr. Lori Elliott Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 18 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Elliott ( CPSO# 72530 )

Business Address:
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone Number: (519) 751-5544

Business Address:
302-3155 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3N8
Phone Number: (289) 217-7947

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 29 Nov 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LORI THERESA ELLIOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELLIOTT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2000