Elliott, Mark Harry (CPSO#: 32617)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 29 Aug 1988

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 18 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Nov 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 1984
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 29 Aug 1988