Ellis, Chelsey Louise (CPSO#: 92926)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 14 Dec 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Dec 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Microbiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Microbiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Microbiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 16 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Microbiology

University of Ottawa, 17 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Microbiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 16 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Microbiology

University of Ottawa, 17 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Microbiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 14 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Microbiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Dec 2015