Ellis, Janet Winifred Maude (CPSO#: 85103)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cambridge, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto
M4N 3M5
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4073
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ellis-De Ruiter Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 20 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ellis ( CPSO# 85103 )
Dr. J. De Ruiter ( CPSO# 72857 )

Business Address:
Department of Psychiatry
F Wing
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Business Address:
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Anaesthesia
2211 - 555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-5224

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANET WINIFRED MAUDE ELLIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELLIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 08 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 09 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 09 Aug 2010 to 08 Aug 2011
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2010