Ellis, Susan Maureen Ollerhead (CPSO#: 65173)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Josephs Healthcare
Dept of Obstetrics & Gynecology
2Nd Floor Fontbonne
301 James St S
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 521-6041
Fax: (905) 383-3336
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Susan Ellis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 22 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ellis ( CPSO# 65173 )

Business Address:
301 James Street South
Second Floor Fontbonne Building
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 521-6041

Business Address:
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 07 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSAN MAUREEN OLLERHEAD ELLIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELLIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Mar 1997
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Apr 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1993