Ellwood, Amanda Dawn (CPSO#: 84744)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1705 Badham Blvd
Regina SK  S4P 0L9
Phone: (306) 552-5611
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1440 14th Ave
Regina SK  S4P 0W5
Canada
County: 
Electoral District: 

4101 Dewdney Ave
Regina SK  S4T 1A5
Canada
County: 
Electoral District: 
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amanda Dawn Ellwood Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 20 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ellwood ( CPSO# 84744 )

Business Address:
1705 Badham Boulevard
Regina SK  S4P 0L9
Phone Number: (306) 552-5611

Business Address:
Regina General Hospital
1440 14 Avenue
Regina SK  S4P 0W5
Phone Number: (306) 766-7034

Business Address:
Pasqua Hospital
4101 Dewdney Avenue
Regina SK  S4T 1A5

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saskatchewan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 26 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMANDA DAWN ELLWOOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELLWOOD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2010