Elmekkawi, Amir Elsayed (CPSO#: 96626)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Apr 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 15 Apr 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: Elmekkawi Mohamed, Amir Elsayed Abdou (used until: 02 May 2016 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Mansoura University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health
Department of Paediatrics
1 Hospital Ct
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 665-9001
Fax: (905) 665-9335
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Kingston General Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Canada
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Suite 306
220 Dundas St W
Whitby ON  L1N 8M7
Canada
Phone: (905) 665-9001
Fax: (905) 665-9335
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Elmekkawi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 28 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Elmekkawi ( CPSO# 96626 )

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health
Department of Paediatrics
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Business Address:
220 Dundas Street West
Suite 306
Whitby ON  L1N 8M7
Phone Number: (905) 665-9001

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-6046

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 15 Apr 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 09 Sep 2011 to 01 Dec 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 02 Dec 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 12 Apr 2016
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Apr 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Apr 2016
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Apr 2018
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 19 Apr 2018 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Amir Elsayed Elmekkawi may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Paediatrics,  Queen's  University,  in which Dr. Elmekkawi holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, 
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires  seven  years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Elmekkawi  no longer holds the  academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The  certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events,  unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  College  receives  a  report  indicating  that Dr. Elmekkawi's
                        clinical  performance,  knowledge,  skill,  judgment,  professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee  does  not receive an annual report  or  receives  a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when  the  Committee  makes   a   decision  about  Dr.  Elmekkawi's
                        certificate  of  registration,  following   consideration   of  the
                        practice assessment report. 
                  
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is  issued  on April 15, 2016, and expires on June 30,
                  2019.  Upon renewal of Dr. Elmekkawi's  academic  appointment  at Queen's
                  University,  the  expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations
                  in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.