Elmi, Maryam (CPSO#: 95602)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 1506 - 20 Baif Blvd Richmond Hill, ON L4C 8T1
Date Received: 22 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2018