Elnahas, Ahmad Ibrahim (CPSO#: 88680)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Apr 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of General Surgery
LHSC, University Hospital
Rm C8-131
339 Windamere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3612
Fax: (519) 663-3906
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ahmad Elnahas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Elnahas ( CPSO# 88680 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Department of General Surgery
8 Main Pavilion-Room 325
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5224

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AHMAD IBRAHIM ELNAHAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELNAHAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Apr 2014