Elorriaga Claraco, Alejandro (CPSO#: 67665)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Oviedo, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jan 1994 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Clinical Fellow - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jan 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Feb 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Feb 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Dec 1996