Elrify, Elsaid Ragab Mahmoud (CPSO#: 89643)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 17 Jul 2008

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Alexandria, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ajax & Pickering hospital
Department of Paediatrics
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone: (905) 683-2320 Ext. 4680
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elrify Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 17 2012


Corporation Name: Elrify Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 17 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Elrify ( CPSO# 89643 )

Business Address:
RVHS Rouge Valley Ajax & Pickering
Department of Paediatrics
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 17 Jul 2008 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Jul 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 16 Jan 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Nov 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Nov 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Oct 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 May 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Sep 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 15 Sep 2016 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Elsaid  Ragab  Mahmoud  Elrify  may  practise  medicine  independently  in
            paediatrics and neonatology.