Elsohemy, Amal Salah (CPSO#: 95980)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Halton Family Health Center
2951 Walkers Line
Burlington ON  L7M 4Y1
Phone: (905) 336-3437
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amal Elsohemy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 05 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Elsohemy ( CPSO# 95980 )

Business Address:
Halton Family Health Center
2951 Walker's Line
Burlington ON  L7M 4Y1
Phone Number: (905) 336-3437

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMAL SALAH ELSOHEMY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELSOHEMY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013