Eltahawy, Hazem Abdalla (CPSO#: 76011)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Ain Shams University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2001 to 31 Jan 2002
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2002 to 28 Feb 2002
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 15 Nov 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 May 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Nov 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Dec 2003
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Jan 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004