Eltayeb, Suha Amin Elserswai (CPSO#: 68059)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jul 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
601 Harwood Avenue
Suite 202
Ajax ON  L1S 2J5
Phone: (905) 427-0558
Fax: (905) 427-1268
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3100 BROCK STREET NORTH SUITE 7
Whitby ON  L1R 3J7
Canada
Phone: 9056653100
Fax: 9056653120
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Suha Eltayeb Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 11 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Eltayeb ( CPSO# 68059 )

Business Address:
202 - 601 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J5
Phone Number: (905) 427-0558


Corporation Name: Eltayeb and Rubabaza Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 11 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Eltayeb ( CPSO# 68059 )
Dr. J. Rubabaza ( CPSO# 82500 )

Business Address:
3100 Brock Street
Suite 7
Whitby ON  L1R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 665-3100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUHA AMIN ELSERSWAI ELTAYEB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELTAYEB is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 1999