Eltorki, Mohamed Mahmoud Fahmi (CPSO#: 92975)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Apr 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Apr 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Alexandria, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
HHSC McMaster Children's Hospital
Department of Pediatric
Emergency Medicine
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: 9055212100 Ext. 75155
Fax: 9055708992
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2540 Postmaster Drive
Oakville ON  L6M 0M2
Canada
Phone: 905-847-5437
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

C107-3885 DUKE OF YORK BLVD
Mississauga ON  L5B 0B2
Canada
Phone: 905-366-4441
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mohamed Eltorki Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 18 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Eltorki ( CPSO# 92975 )

Business Address:
2540 Postwater Drive
Oakville ON  L6M 0M2
Phone Number: (905) 847-5437

Business Address:
Suite 1
4033 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L4Z 0B8

Business Address:
Suite C107
3885 Duke Of York Boulevard
Mississauga ON  L5B 0B2
Phone Number: (905) 366-4441

Business Address:
HHSC McMaster Children's Hospital
Department of Pediatric Emergency Medicine
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Paediatric Emergency Medicine Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMED MAHMOUD FAHMI ELTORKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELTORKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 21 Oct 2014 to 17 Nov 2014
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Nov 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 2015