Emini, Neim Nick (CPSO#: 92181)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Nov 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Nov 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The Flinders Univ of South Australia, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Orangeville Family Medical Centre
Suite 100
1 Elizabeth Street
Orangeville ON  L9W 7N7
Phone: (519) 938-8000
Fax: (519) 938-8080
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nick Emini Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 12 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Emini ( CPSO# 92181 )

Business Address:
Orangeville Family Medical Centre
100 - 1 Elizabeth Street
Orangeville ON  L9W 7N7
Phone Number: (519) 938-8000

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Australia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Oct 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NEIM NICK EMINI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EMINI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 20 Oct 2009 to 11 Jan 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 12 Jan 2010 to 19 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 20 Oct 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 24 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Oct 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2011