Emmenegger, Urban Josef (CPSO#: 83857)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 May 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 May 2008

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German

Education:University of Bern, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Odette Cancer Centre, T2-054
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4928
Fax: (416) 480-6002
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. U. Emmenegger Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 28 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. U. Emmenegger ( CPSO# 83857 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Odette Cancer Centre
T2-054 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4928

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 May 2008 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 13 Mar 2014 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2005 to 24 Jan 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 25 Jan 2006 to 30 Oct 2006
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 31 Oct 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Apr 2008
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 May 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Mar 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 13 Mar 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 13 Mar 2014 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Urban  Josef  Emmenegger  may  practise  medicine independently in medical
            oncology, only.