Engels, Paul Thomas (CPSO#: 92753)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital
6 North Wing, Room 617
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 44520
Fax: (905) 577-1459
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Paul Engels Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 23 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Engels ( CPSO# 92753 )
Dr. L. Eiriksson ( CPSO# 89877 )

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
6 North Wing
Room 617
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL THOMAS ENGELS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ENGELS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2013