English, Penny Gabrielle (CPSO#: 91502)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 204
430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C1
Phone: (519) 576-2992
Fax: (519) 576-7650
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

75 University Ave. W
Waterloo ON  N2L 3C5
Canada
Phone: (519) 884-1970 Ext. 3146
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PENNY GABRIELLE ENGLISH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ENGLISH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2013