Engmann, Abena Adwokua (CPSO#: 93155)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Dec 2013

Summary

Former Name: Otchere Engmann, Abena Adwokua (used until: 31 Oct 2013 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 203
369 Mary Street
Wiarton ON  N0H 2T0
Phone: (519) 534-5220
Fax: (519) 534-1024
Electoral District: 03

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Wiarton Site Wiarton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ABENA ADWOKUA ENGMANN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ENGMANN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 20 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2013