Ennis, Maurice Anthony (CPSO#: 95556)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Dec 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Dec 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
24 CF Health Services Centre
50 Yukon St
Astra ON  K0K 3W0
Phone: (613) 392-2811 Ext. 3480
Fax: 613-965-4912
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Englehart and District Hospital Englehart
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial Trenton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAURICE ANTHONY ENNIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ENNIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2013