Enns, Robert Allan (CPSO#: 81977)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 02 Mar 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Mar 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 30 Sep 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Oct 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Mar 2010