Enright, Paula Dawn (CPSO#: 82638)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
501 Smyth Road
#5235
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 77220
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. English and Enright Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 06 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. English ( CPSO# 84955 )
Dr. P. Enright ( CPSO# 82638 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Critical Care
F202 - 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 274-1610

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAULA DAWN ENRIGHT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ENRIGHT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 09 Mar 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Palliative Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Palliative Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 26 Sep 2011
Clinical Fellow - Palliative Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 27 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2007