Entwistle, Brandon Michael Joseph (CPSO#: 93264)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone: (705) 759-3434 Ext. 6887
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brandon Entwistle Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 10 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Entwistle ( CPSO# 93264 )

Business Address:
Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone Number: (705) 759-3434

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRANDON MICHAEL JOSEPH ENTWISTLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ENTWISTLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015