Enzevaei, Atoosa (CPSO#: 95635)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Nov 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, Persian

Education:AHWAZ UNIVERSITY OF MEDICAL SCIENCES, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Regional Health Centre
Department of Internal Medicine
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905)895-4521
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Enzevaei Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 10 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Enzevaei ( CPSO# 95635 )

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
Department of Internal Medicine
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 26 Aug 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ATOOSA ENZEVAEI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ENZEVAEI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 29 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 30 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 25 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 26 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 25 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 26 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 23 Mar 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Nov 2014