Erdelyi, Barbara (CPSO#: 74032)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 410
4800 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2J 2K9
Phone: (416) 497-9900
Fax: (416) 497-6992
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Barbara Erdelyi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Erdelyi ( CPSO# 74032 )

Business Address:
Suite 410
4800 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2J 2K9
Phone Number: (416) 497-9900

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BARBARA ERDELYI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ERDELYI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2001