Ergun, Suzan Selin (CPSO#: 95579)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Mar 2018

Expiry Date:  19 Mar 2021

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 20 Mar 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences
Hamilton General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
237 Barton St E
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hamilton Health Sciences
Juravinski Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
711 Concession St
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Hamilton Health Sciences
McMaster University Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
1200 Main St W
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Suzan Ergun Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 31 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ergun ( CPSO# 95579 )

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences
Hamilton General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 20 Mar 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 07 Mar 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 08 Mar 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 07 Mar 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 08 Mar 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 28 Feb 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Mar 2018
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 19 Mar 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 20 Mar 2018 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  Suzan  Selin  Ergun  may  practise  anaesthesia with Hamilton Health
                  Sciences at Hamilton General Hospital, Juravinski  Hospital  and McMaster
                  University   Hospital  in  Hamilton,  Ontario,  while  under  supervision
                  coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

            2.    The certificate  of  registration  automatically expires three years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Ergun's  eligibility  to  take the Royal
                  College  of  Physicians  and  Surgeons  of  Canada  examination  expires,
                  whichever comes first.

            3.    The  certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events,  unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  supervisor  notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr.
                        Ergun's knowledge,  skill,  judgment  or attitude, does not provide
                        the required reports to the College by  the  due  date  or  if  the
                        reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing  to  continue to
                        supervise Dr. Ergun's practice.
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is  issued  on  March 20, 2018, and will expire on  or
                  before March 19, 2021, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.