Ernst, Blair David (CPSO#: 73549)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Hospital
Dept of Hematology
2200 Eglinton Avenue W
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-1100 Ext. 5331
Fax: (905) 813-3874
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Credit Valley Hospital
Dept of Oncology
2200 Eglinton Avenue W
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Canada
Phone: (905) 813-1100 Ext. 5130
Fax: (905) 813-4024
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Blair D. Ernst Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 03 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Ernst ( CPSO# 73549 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-1100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 20 Sep 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BLAIR DAVID ERNST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ERNST is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2004