Ernst, Caroline Doreen (CPSO#: 71051)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Nov 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Nov 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Childrens Hospital
send mail to- P O Box 65559 Dundas
133 King Street West
Dundas ON L9H 2V0
Dundas ON  L9H 6Y6
Phone: (905) 521-5030
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 03 Nov 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROLINE DOREEN ERNST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ERNST is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 05 May 1997 to 01 Jun 1997
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 20 Apr 1998 to 15 May 1998
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 02 Nov 1998 to 27 Nov 1998
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 15 Mar 1999 to 09 Apr 1999
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 10 Nov 1999
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 May 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Apr 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 May 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Nov 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Apr 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Nov 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Nov 1999