Ernst, Jaclyn Ashley (CPSO#: 98030)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 May 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Department of GIM
501 Smyth Road
Box 209
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 77137
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JACLYN ASHLEY ERNST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ERNST is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 May 2017