Ernst, Matthew Scott (CPSO#: 109127)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
McMaster University
Room MDCL - 3101A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: 905-525-9140 Ext. 22116
Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MATTHEW SCOTT ERNST shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ERNST is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. ERNST shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ERNST is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. ERNST shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ERNST is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ERNST no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019