Erola, Kelly Ann (CPSO#: 59372)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lower Cape Fear Hospice
1414 Physicians Drive
Wilmington NC  28401
United States
Phone: 9107967900 Ext. 135
Fax: 9107967901
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit 1
12 Walford Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 2H4
Canada
Phone: 705-866-5652
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Georgia
USA - North Carolina
USA - South Carolina

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KELLY ANN EROLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EROLA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1988 to 14 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 06 Aug 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1989