Erragamreddy, Sai Kalyan Reddy (CPSO#: 96889)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Feb 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Feb 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil, Telugu

Education:Rajah Muthiah Medical College, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
300 Rossland Rd East, Suite105
Ajax ON  L1Z 0M1
Phone: 905-239-7663
Fax: 905-239-4664
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAI KALYAN REDDY ERRAGAMREDDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ERRAGAMREDDY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 24 Oct 2011 to 15 Jan 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 16 Jan 2012 to 21 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 22 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 20 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Oct 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Aug 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Feb 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2015