Erstling, Rachel Sara (CPSO#: 81271)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Niagara Region Mental Health
3550 Schmon Parkway, Unit 2
Thorold ON  L2V 4Y6
Phone: (905) 688-2854 Ext. 7223
Fax: (905) 684-9798
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Refuge
Hamilton Centre for Newcomer Health
183 Hughson Street S
Hamilton ON  L8N 2B6
Canada
Phone: (905) 526-0000
Fax: (905) 526-0001
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Shelter Health Network
c/o Good Shepherd Barrett Centre
128 Emerald Street South
Hamilton ON  L8N 2V5
Canada
Phone: (905) 526-7137
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Psychiatric Emergency Services
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Canada
Phone: (905) 522-1155
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. S. Erstling Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 28 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Erstling ( CPSO# 81271 )

Business Address:
2 - 3550 Schmon Parkway
2nd Floor
Thorold ON  L2V 4T7
Phone Number: (905) 688-2854

Business Address:
128 Emerald Street South
Hamilton ON  L8N 2V5
Phone Number: (905) 526-7137

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre,Regional Rehabilitation Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Chedoke Hospital Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 16 Jul 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RACHEL SARA ERSTLING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ERSTLING is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2009 to 16 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 17 Aug 2009 to 16 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2010