Escudero, Carolina Andrea (CPSO#: 90315)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 31 Aug 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Paediatric Cardiology Effective: 26 Dec 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 06 Apr 2009 to 03 May 2009
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 19 Oct 2009 to 13 Nov 2009
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 20 May 2013 to 14 Jun 2013
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 May 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Nov 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 May 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016