Eskandar, Ayman Abulmoqtader A (CPSO#: 81640)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 11 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Saud University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Jun 2010