Eskander, Ihab Albair Aziz (CPSO#: 78744)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Dec 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 11 Feb 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 14
450 West Heights Drive
Kitchener ON  N2N 2B9
Phone: (519) 584-7411
Fax: (519) 584-7967
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ihab Eskander Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 14 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Eskander ( CPSO# 78744 )

Business Address:
450 Westheights Drive
Unit 14
Kitchener ON  N2N 2B9
Phone Number: (519) 584-7411

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2002
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2014
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 11 Feb 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 11 Feb 2014 Active View Details [+]

            As from February 11, 2014, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Ihab Albair Aziz
            Eskander, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Eskander
            to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Effective immediately, Dr. Ihab Albair Aziz Eskander shall not engage in
                  any professional encounters with female patients of any age, in any
                  jurisdiction, unless the patient encounter takes place in the presence of
                  a female regulated health professional approved by the College, and
                  unless the other requirements provided in his Undertaking with the
                  College are fulfilled.  For further clarity, Dr. Ihab Albair Aziz
                  Eskander may not be alone with any female patient, for any period of
                  time, during any professional encounter.  

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 22 Jun 2009
Summary:

 On June 22, 2009, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Eskander committed an act of professional 
 misconduct, in that he engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, 
 having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, 
 dishonourable or unprofessional.

Dr. Eskander practiced medicine in Egypt between 1992 and 1995, 
 at which time he moved to Ontario. In 1999, Dr. Eskander applied to the Newfoundland Medical 
 Board. He practised as a family doctor in Newfoundland between 2000 and 2002. In 2002, Dr. 
 Eskander applied for a certificate of registration from the College of Physicians and Surgeons of 
 Ontario (CPSO). Dr. Eskander admitted that he supplied information to the Newfoundland Medical 
 Board and the CPSO which was not accurate, in that it failed to disclose interruptions in practice 
 after Dr. Eskander came to Canada in 1995.

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed 
 that:

1.  Dr. Eskander successfully complete, at his own expense, the College's Medical Ethics 
 and Informed Consent Course on the next available date, and in any event within six months of the 
 date of the Order, and to provide proof thereof to the College.

2.  Dr. Eskander appear before 
 the panel to be reprimanded.

3.  Dr. Eskander pay to the College costs in the amount of $3,650 
 within 30 days of the date of the Order.

4.  The results of this proceeding be included in the 
 register.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): June 22, 2009