Esken, Martin (CPSO#: 89210)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Dec 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Dec 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: 905-494-2120
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

William Osler Health System
Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Peel Memorial
20 Lynch Street
Brampton ON  L6W2Z8
Canada
Phone: 9054942120
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Martin Esken Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 04 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Esken ( CPSO# 89210 )

Business Address:
William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Nov 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARTIN ESKEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ESKEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Jan 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Feb 2010 to 31 Mar 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Apr 2010 to 30 Nov 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Dec 2010 to 30 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Dec 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Nov 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 13 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Dec 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 2013