Esmail, Najwa S (CPSO#: 75689)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 06 May 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 May 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Oct 2000 to 15 Oct 2000
Elective Trainee - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 12 Feb 2001 to 09 Mar 2001
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 11 Apr 2001 to 06 May 2001
Elective Trainee - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Oct 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Mar 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 May 2001