Espina, Melanie Renee (CPSO#: 89481)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Canadian Forces Health Services
Centre Ottawa
101 Colonel By Drive
Ottawa ON  K1A 0K2
Phone: (613) 945-1473
Fax: (613) 945-1509
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Richard Waldolf Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 03 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Waldolf ( CPSO# 88651 )
Dr. M. Espina ( CPSO# 89481 )

Business Address:
Winchester District Memorial Hospital
566 Louise Street
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Phone Number: (613) 774-2420

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELANIE RENEE ESPINA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ESPINA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2012