Esselmont, Elizabeth Ashley (CPSO#: 95460)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa Health Service
300-100 Marie Curie Private
Ottawa, ON
Ottawa ON  K1N 6N5
Phone: (613) 564-3950
Fax: 613-564-6627
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Ottawa Hospital- General Campus
Mother Baby Unit- 8E
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Canada
Phone: 613-737-8733
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELIZABETH ASHLEY ESSELMONT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ESSELMONT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2015