Estanbul, Fatuma Abdi (CPSO#: 79688)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Sep 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Sep 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Amharic, English, Ethiopian, German, Somalian

Education:Addis Ababa University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1723 Kipling Ave,Etobicoke, ON
Toronto ON  M9R 4E1
Phone: 647-748-8011
Fax: 647-748-8012
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

807 Broadview Ave, Toronto, ON
Toronto ON  M4K 2P8
Canada
Phone: 416 461 9471
Fax: 416 461 2710
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

620 Bloor Street
Mississauga ON  L5A 3V9
Canada
Phone: 905 277 1222
Fax: 905 277 2221
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

980 Central Park Dr.
Brampton ON  L6S 3L7
Canada
Phone: 905 458 4771
Fax: 905 458 5376
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fatuma Abdi Estanbul Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 18 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Estanbul ( CPSO# 79688 )

Business Address:
Suite G2
1723 Kipling Avenue
Etobicoke ON  M6R 2E1
Phone Number: (647) 748-8011

Business Address:
4 - 980 Central Park Drive
Brampton ON  L6S 3C7
Phone Number: (905) 458-4771

Business Address:
620 Bloor Street
Mississauga ON  L5R 3V9
Phone Number: (905) 277-1222

Business Address:
807 Broadview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 2P8
Phone Number: (416) 461-9471

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 22 May 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FATUMA ABDI ESTANBUL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ESTANBUL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Dec 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 2013