Etemadi, Behzad Ali Sanii (CPSO#: 85142)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lawrence Park Cardiology
Suite #4076
3080 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4N 3N1
Phone: 6473476644
Fax: 6473476647
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

PACE Cardiology
Unit #302
11 Lakeside Terrace
Barrie ON  L4M0H9
Canada
Phone: 7057214422
Fax: 7057215577
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Alliston Diagnostic Centre
Unit 21
117 Young Street
Alliston ON  L9R 0E9
Canada
Phone: (705) 434-0074
Fax: (705) 434-9074
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Behzad Etemadi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 21 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Etemadi ( CPSO# 85142 )

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 725-9090

Business Address:
302 - 11 Lakeside Terrace
Barrie ON  L4M 0H9
Phone Number: (888) 662-0680

Business Address:
21-23 - 117 Young Street
Alliston ON  L9R 0E9
Phone Number: (888) 662-0680

Business Address:
Med Arts Building
602R - 581 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P6

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 May 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 18 Oct 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BEHZAD ALI SANII ETEMADI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ETEMADI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 20 Jan 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2013