Eure, Gregg Rountree (CPSO#: 88040)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 22 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Medical College of Virginia, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Jan 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Feb 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Aug 2008