Evangelista, Raymond Joshua Dumlao (CPSO#: 83407)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 04 May 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 May 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:De La Salle University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 23 Aug 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 24 Aug 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 23 Aug 2008
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 24 Aug 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 04 May 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 May 2015