Evaniuk, Debra Anne (CPSO#: 92821)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 31 May 2010 to 25 Jun 2010
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Aug 2013
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 May 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2013