Evans, Rhodri (CPSO#: 78506)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Aug 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Aug 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sheffield, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Syl Apps Youth Centre
475 Iroquois Shore Road
Oakville
L6M 1H3
Oakville ON  L3R 9Z3
Phone: (905) 844-4110 Ext. 2202
Fax: (905) 844-2996
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

240 Herkimer St
Hamilton ON  L8P 2H9
Canada
Phone: 905 745 4847
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rhodri Evans Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 06 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Evans ( CPSO# 78506 )

Business Address:
Syl Apps Youth Centre
475 Iroquois Shore Road
Oakville ON  L6H 1M3
Phone Number: (905) 844-4110

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 16 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RHODRI EVANS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EVANS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2002