Evans-Olders, Rebecca (CPSO#: 93739)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
South Nepean Community
Health Centre
Suite 201
4100 Strandherd Drive
Nepean ON  K2J 0V2
Phone: (613) 288-2820
Fax: (613) 288-3690
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jul 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REBECCA EVANS-OLDERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EVANS-OLDERS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 01 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 02 Aug 2011 to 01 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2012